Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier (By Request - Baltimore County Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to convene a workgroup to evaluate the establishment of a regional waste disposal facility to serve Anne Arundel County, Baltimore City, Baltimore County, Carroll County, Harford County, and Howard County; providing for the composition of the workgroup; and requiring the workgroup to report certain findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1094
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Workgroup to Evaluate the Establishment of a Regional Waste Disposal Facility
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/19/2021 9:48 AM
Click to return on the top page