Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records
Sponsored by
Senators Muse, Benson, Currie, McFadden, and Waugh
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a provision of law that provides that a person is not entitled to expungement of the person's record if the petition for expungement is based on a specified case disposition other than a specified entry of probation before judgment within 3 years and the person, since the disposition, has been convicted of a crime other than a minor traffic violation or a specified crime; providing that a person is not entitled to expungement of the person's record if the person is a defendant in a pending criminal proceeding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0304
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {858477/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {542617/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (90-49)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Senators Muse, Hough, and Ramirez
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Delegates Anderson, Moon, and Glass
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
72
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (88-49)
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
72
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {858477/2 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 First Reading Judiciary 49
House 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable with Amendments {542617/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (90-49) 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Senate Requests House Recede 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Senators Muse, Hough, and Ramirez 64
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Refuses to Recede 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Delegates Anderson, Moon, and Glass 70
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 68
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Conference Committee Report Adopted 72
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Third Reading Passed (88-49) 72
Senate 4/13/2015 4/10/2015 Passed Enrolled 72
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM