Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Retired Law Enforcement Officer Identification Card - Failure to Issue
Sponsored by
Senators Norman and Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that, to be qualified for a specified retired officer identification card, a retired law enforcement officer be entitled to receive a pension or other retirement allowance; authorizing a retired law enforcement officer to file a civil action against a specified law enforcement agency for failure to issue a retired law enforcement officer identification card; authorizing the retired law enforcement officer to seek specified statutory damages in addition to specified relief; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0465
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM