Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying that a certain insurer that offers or sells a travel insurance policy is required to pay a certain premium tax on certain premiums paid by certain persons; requiring travel insurance to be classified and filed as inland marine insurance; specifying the state of residence for different types of policies; providing that eligibility and underwriting standards for travel insurance may be developed and provided based on certain travel protection plans and certain applicable provisions of law; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {527071/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {133893/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {527071/1 Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Economic Matters 50
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments {133893/1 Adopted 55
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 56
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 58
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Text - Chapter - Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 1-101, 11-801, 19-1001 through 19-1005, 6-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM