Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Safe Harbor for Minors Act of 2013
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a minimum age at which a person may be charged with prostitution offenses; establishing a presumption that if a minor who is 16 or 17 years of age is charged with a prostitution offense, the minor was coerced into committing the offense; and establishing that it is not a defense to a prosecution of prostitution and human trafficking offenses that a person who consented to specified acts may not be prosecuted due to the person's age.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-303, 11-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM