Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Down Syndrome - Required Information
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Brinkley, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Pugh, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to identify up-to-date, evidence-based, written information about Down Syndrome; requiring the Department to provide the information about Down Syndrome to specified health care facilities and specified health care providers; authorizing specified health care facilities and health care providers to provide specified individuals with specified information under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {597875/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {476883/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {597875/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/20/2014 3/17/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 53
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2014 4/02/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments {476883/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Special Order until next session (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 70
House 4/07/2014 4/04/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) 71
Senate 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 66A
Senate 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66A
Senate 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Passed Enrolled 66A
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-1501, 20-1502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM