Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Capital Projects – High Performance and Green Buildings – Alterations (Green Building Restoration Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the application of certain high performance building requirements to apply to capital projects for which more than 50% of the funding is for the acquisition, construction, or renovation of the project is from State funds; repealing a requirement that the Maryland Green Building Council develop guidelines for new public school buildings to achieve a LEED Silver or comparable rating; requiring the Maryland Green Building Council to ensure that certain State buildings, schools and community colleges meet certain standards; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1636
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {934239/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
47B
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - High Performance and Green Buildings - Community Colleges and Public Schools - Repeal of Requirements and Guidelines
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments {934239/1 Adopted 45
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Capital Projects – High Performance and Green Buildings – Alterations (Green Building Restoration Act)
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (37-9) 47
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Appropriations 47B
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:17 AM