Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Benson, Colburn, Feldman, Forehand, Frosh, Kelley, King, Kittleman, Madaleno, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Ramirez, Robey, Rosapepe, and Stone
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting the use of a physical restraint on an inmate while the inmate is in labor or during delivery except under specified circumstances; requiring the specified responsible medical personnel to determine when the inmate's health allows the inmate to be returned to a correctional facility after giving birth; prohibiting, with specified exceptions, a physical restraint from being used on a specified inmate; requiring specified correctional officials to develop a policy for use at each correctional facility; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0027
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0829 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {208075/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
57
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/24/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {208075/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 53
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 57
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-206, 9-601 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM