Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Bates, Jennings, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is convicted of first-degree murder may be sentenced to death under specified circumstances; providing that the murder of a law enforcement officer or a first responder under specified circumstances constitutes aggravating circumstances that the court or jury must consider in making a determination as to the imposition of the death penalty; establishing procedures for the imposition of the death penalty; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-901 through 3-909, 4-101, 4-305, 6-112, 7-301 )
(   12-307, 3-8A-03, 3-8A-06, 8-404, 8-420, 9-204 )
(   11-404, 3-105, 3-106, 3-107, 4-204, 5-101, 7-101, 7-103, 7-107, 7-201 through 7-204, 8-108 )
(   14-101, 2-201, 2-202, 2-301, 2-303, 2-304, 2-305, 2-401 )
(   16-812 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM