Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Cassilly, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hough, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Middleton, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Norman, Pinsky, Ramirez, Ready, Robinson, Rosapepe, Serafini, Smith, Waugh, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System to determine whether to create an independent school board for the Juvenile Services Education System, and identify ways to reform and improve juvenile education services; requiring the Workgroup to convene on or before September 1, 2018; requiring the Workgroup to submit a certain report to the Governor and the General Assembly in a certain format by December 20, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1244
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education System
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM