Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation - End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Legal Services Corporation, in consultation with Civil Justice, Inc., to establish the End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program to provide low- and moderate-income seniors with the preparation of legal documents, legal assistance in civil proceedings, and other matters; specifying eligibility requirements for participation in the Program; requiring the Program to establish a certain intake method, establish a certain outreach method, and provide for the services of at least one full-time attorney; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Maryland Legal Services Corporation - End-of-Life Legal Services Pilot Program
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM