Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes Relating to Animals - Surgery on Dogs - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person, other than a licensed veterinarian using anesthesia when appropriate, from performing specified procedures on a dog; and establishing penalties for a violation of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0665
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {868270/1
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {693122/2
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Gladden) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Gladden) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {693122/2 Withdrawn
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Gladden) {493925/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {693122/2
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {282715/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {868270/1 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Committee Amendment Adopted 42
Senate 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 42
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {693122/2 43
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Special Order until later today (Senator Gladden) Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Gladden) Adopted 43
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {693122/2 Withdrawn 44
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Gladden) {493925/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/17/2014 3/09/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {693122/2 46
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Judiciary 51
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments {282715/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1) 63
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-624 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM