Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations - Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 720
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a certain provision of law specifying a certain processing fee for articles of transfer; repealing each provision of law regarding executing and filing articles of transfer; altering the types of actions not required by a corporation for certain transfers of assets, creations of security interests, or exchanges of shares of stocks; clarifying that a transfer of assets by a corporation occurring before October 1, 2018, is not invalid solely because of a failure to file articles of transfer with the Department; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0873
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Corporations - Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {208874/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Corporations - Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 720
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Corporations - Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Corporations - Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {208874/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Corporations - Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Referred Economic Matters 47
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 720
Text - Chapter - Corporations - Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 1-203, 1-301, 3-104, 3-107, 3-108, 3-109, 3-110, 3-111, 3-112, 3-113, 3-115, 3-203 )
(   14-113 )
(   12-101, 12-103, 12-109, 13-101, 13-404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM