Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Equity Participation Investment Program - Small Businesses
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Jones-Rodwell, Muse, Middleton, Astle, Brinkley, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the purpose of the Equity Participation Investment Program to encourage and help socially or economically disadvantaged individuals to create and develop small businesses and acquire existing businesses in the State; making conforming changes to specified findings of the General Assembly, the authority of the Maryland Small Business Development Financing Authority, and the contents of specified business plans; altering the amount the Authority may invest using equity participation financing; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {367172/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-36)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments {367172/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/17/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/18/2014 3/15/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 51
House 3/27/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 59
House 3/31/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (99-36) 60
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-549, 5-550, 5-551, 5-552, 5-553, 5-554, 5-556, 5-557 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM