Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Prostate Cancer Screening - Prohibiting Cost-Sharing
Sponsored by
Senators Augustine, Beidle, Benson, Ellis, Feldman, Griffith, Hayes, Hershey, Jennings, Kelley, Klausmeier, Kramer, Lam, McCray, Miller, Patterson, Smith, and Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from applying a deductible, a copayment, or coinsurance to coverage for prostate cancer screenings; prohibiting certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from reducing or eliminating certain coverage due to certain provisions of law; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2021; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0852
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Insurance - Prostate Cancer Screening - Prohibiting Cost-Sharing
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/28/2020 4:59 PM