Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Rental Vehicle Companies - Right of Subrogation
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Astle, Brinkley, Feldman, Kittleman, and Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a rental vehicle company or its designee has a specified right of subrogation against specified persons for specified claims paid by the rental vehicle company or the designee that arose out of the use or operation of the rental vehicle; requiring a rental vehicle company that receives a third party claim to provide a specified notice; authorizing an insurer to assume the handling of a specified claim; requiring a rental vehicle company to handle a claim until a specified insurer assumes the handling; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0730
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM