Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for Pregnancy
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Conway, Manno, Pinsky, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified health benefit plans and specified carriers to provide a special enrollment period during which specified individuals who become pregnant may enroll in a health benefit plan; establishing the duration of the special enrollment period; establishing specified effective dates of coverage for specified individuals enrolled in specified health benefit plans during the special enrollment period; applying the Act to all health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on and after January 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
(   15-1201, 15-1208.1, 15-1316 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page