Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Commission on Multicultural Education – Establishment
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Multicultural Education to develop standards and a model statewide curriculum for multicultural education and a certain framework for teachers and students; requiring the Commission to conduct certain research and develop certain recommendations; requiring the Commission to submit an interim report and a final report on its findings and recommendations to certain entities on or before July 1, 2023, and July 1, 2024; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education – Commission on Multicultural Education – Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Education – Commission on Multicultural Education – Establishment
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
(   7-126 )
Last Updated: 2/12/2021 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page