Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fair Scheduling, Wages, and Benefits Act
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Currie, Kagan, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Muse, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an employer to provide specified employees with specified estimates and work schedules within specified time periods and notify employees of specified changes; prohibiting an employer, except under specified circumstances, from requiring an employee to work specified hours; authorizing an employer to make specified changes to a scheduled shift within a specified period of time; requiring an employer, except under specified circumstances, to pay specified predictability pay under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1175
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-106, 3-102, 3-103, 3-1301 through 3-1313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM