Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required Notices
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Benson, Feldman, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Manno, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a consumer reporting agency from charging a consumer a fee for placing a security freeze, or for the first two temporary lifts of a security freeze in a calendar year, if the consumer has received a notice of a breach of the security of a system under specified provisions of State law or from or on behalf of a federal agency, and provides a copy of the notice to the consumer reporting agency; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0782
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1212.1, 14-3504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM