Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Recreational Fishing Licenses - Duration and Expiration Date
Sponsored by
Senators Bates, Salling, and Simonaire
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the expiration date for and, under specified circumstances, the duration of specified recreational fishing licenses; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish by regulation a term for a specified recreational fishing license; and requiring the Department to proportionally prorate the annual license fees for specified recreational fishing licenses.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0785
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344537/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {500217/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Stein) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Motion Recede (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
House Recede
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments {344537/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/20/2015 3/18/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 48
House 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments {500217/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Special Order until 4/11 (Delegate Stein) Adopted 65
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 64
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Senate Requests House Recede 64
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Motion Recede (Delegate Barve) Adopted 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 House Recede 69
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 69
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 376
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-210.1, 4-216, 4-604, 4-745 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM