Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Gleaning
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a qualified farm a credit, for tax years 2014 through 2016, of up to $5,000 against the State income tax; providing that the credit is equal to 50% of the value of an eligible food donation or 75% of the value of donated certified organic produce; providing, for a calendar year, the total amount of tax credit certificates issued may not exceed $250,000; extending the termination date of a specified Task Force; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1083
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {849034/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {849034/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/20/2014 3/17/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 53
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-736 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM