Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License
Sponsored by
Senator Kasemeyer
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating in Howard County an exception to the alcoholic beverages license application or renewal requirements for a Class C (continuing care retirement community) beer, wine, and liquor license issued to a nonprofit organization; requiring that the license be applied for and issued to a manager or supervisor and two officers under specified circumstances; and allowing residents and their guests in a continuing care retirement community that holds the license to consume beer, wine, or liquor not purchased from the community; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1090
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/30/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/18/2017 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 43
House 3/29/2016 3/30/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 58
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56A
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   23-102, 23-1404, 23-2704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM