Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Ostomy Equipment and Supplies - Required
Sponsored by
Senators Astle and Benson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide specified health insurance benefits under specified insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage for specified equipment and supplies used for the treatment of ostomies; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner, in consultation with the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene, to adopt by regulation and periodically update a list of specified ostomy equipment and supplies; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-847 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM