Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
Senator Conway (Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee)
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Physicians and allied health advisory committees in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (Sunset Law) by extending to July 1, 2018, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board and committees; requiring the Board to adopt regulations to allow a licensee to receive up to a specified number of credit hours for providing specified services; establishing disciplinary panels through which allegations are to be resolved; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB1096
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {724138/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/26/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments {724138/1 Report Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 55
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/02/2013 4/02/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2013 4/03/2013 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-102, 14-101, 14-202, 14-205, 14-206, 14-206.1, 14-207, 14-316, 14-401, 14-403 through 14-405.1, 14-406, 14-407, 14-408, 14-409, 14-410, 14-411, 14-411.1, 14-413, 14-414, 14-416, 14-504, 14-506, 14-5A-04, 14-5A-06, 14-5A-07, 14-5A-16, 14-5A-17, 14-5A-17.1, 14-5A-18, 14-5A-18.1, 14-5A-19, 14-5A-25, 14-5B-04, 14-5B-05, 14-5B-06, 14-5B-13, 14-5B-14, 14-5B-14.1, 14-5B-15, 14-5B-15.1, 14-5B-16, 14-5B-21, 14-5C-04, 14-5C-06, 14-5C-07, 14-5C-16, 14-5C-17, 14-5C-18, 14-5C-18.1, 14-5C-19, 14-5C-25, 14-5D-03, 14-5D-05, 14-5D-06, 14-5D-14, 14-5D-15, 14-5D-16, 14-5D-16.1, 14-5D-20, 14-5E-04, 14-5E-06, 14-5E-07, 14-5E-15, 14-5E-16, 14-5E-18, 14-5E-18.1, 14-5E-19, 14-5E-25, 14-603, 14-702, 15-101, 15-103, 15-202, 15-205, 15-206, 15-302, 15-310, 15-312, 15-314 through 15-316, 15-316.1, 15-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM