Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Diabetes Management Program
Sponsored by
Senators Young and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education and the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with specified other organizations, to establish specified guidelines for the training of trained diabetes care providers; establishing the purpose of the program is to have trained employee volunteers available to provide diabetes care services to students with diabetes during school hours, and when possible, at school-sponsored activities, including field trips and extracurricular activities; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0992
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824436/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824436/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Eckardt)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Eckardt) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Eckardt) {343126/2
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Eckardt) {343126/2
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Motion separate amendments (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Eckardt) {343126/2 Rejected (18-28)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {824436/1 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Laid Over (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 44
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {824436/1 Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Eckardt) 46
Senate 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Eckardt) Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Eckardt) {343126/2 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Conway) Adopted 47
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Eckardt) {343126/2 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Motion separate amendments (Senator Young) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Young) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Eckardt) {343126/2 Rejected (18-28) 48
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/25/2015 3/22/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 49
House 3/26/2015 3/24/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-437, 7-438 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM