Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit and Nonprofit Beer Festival Permit
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring specified licensing boards to collect a $100 fee for a nonprofit beer festival permit; authorizing the Comptroller to issue a brewing company off-site permit to specified persons who meet specified requirements; establishing that specified holders of a brewing company off-site permit may use the permit for specified activities during specified events; authorizing a nonprofit beer festival permit holder to purchase beer at wholesale to provide and sell beer for specified purposes under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0526
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {964531/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/22/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {964531/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48
House 3/24/2015 3/22/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 52
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-105, 2-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM