Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Fees - General Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions creating the State Board of Environmental Health Specialists Fund; and requiring the State Board of Environmental Health Specialists to pay money collected for its services into the General Fund of the State.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1484
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Fees - General Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/04/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Fees - General Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
46
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Fees - General Fund
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Favorable Adopted 43
Senate 3/09/2020 3/04/2020 Second Reading Passed 43
Text - Third - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Fees - General Fund
Senate 3/11/2020 3/06/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 45
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Appropriations 46
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:48 AM