Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Probation - Sexual Crimes Involving a Minor
Sponsored by
Senators Jacobs, DeGrange, Forehand, Hershey, Shank, and Stone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding specified sexual crimes involving a minor to a list of crimes for which a court may order probation for a time longer than the sentence imposed subject to specified limitations; and repealing a specified requirement that a specified defendant consent in writing to a specified order of probation.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0858
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-207, 11-208, 3-324 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM