Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information Workgroup
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Benson, Forehand, Frosh, Montgomery, Pinsky, and Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information Workgroup; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding the establishment of a pesticide use database; requiring the Workgroup to make a preliminary report on or before December 31, 2013, and report its final findings and recommendations to committees of the General Assembly on or before July 1, 2014; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0775
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654637/1
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654637/1
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted (25-19)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) {443521/1 Rejected (14-30)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {163021/2 Adopted (43-1)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-10)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-33)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable with Amendments {654637/1 58
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments {654637/1 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Committee Amendment Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Special Order until 4/3 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted (25-19) 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) {443521/1 Rejected (14-30) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {163021/2 Adopted (43-1) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (37-10) 61
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 62
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (106-33) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM