Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 (BSL-3) Laboratory Safety Program
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Biosafety Level 3 (BSL-3) Laboratory Safety Program; requiring the Program to identify specified BSL-3 laboratories in the State and their locations and collect other information regarding safety issues relevant to BSL-3 laboratories; and requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to report annually to the General Assembly and specified local jurisdictions in a specified manner specified aggregate information regarding BSL-3 laboratories in the State.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0665
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM