Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Nontrial Convictions
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Hough, Lee, McFadden, Smith, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining the term "conviction" as it relates to the standard required to file a petition for writ of actual innocence by a person convicted at trial; and establishing a standard required to file a petition for writ of actual innocence by a person convicted as a result of a guilty plea, an Alford plea, or a plea of nolo contendere.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1393
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Referred to interim study by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Nontrial Convictions
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Referred to interim study by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:36 AM