Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
College Affordability Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Senators Kasemeyer, Currie, DeGrange, Ferguson, Guzzone, King, Madaleno, Manno, Peters, and Brochin
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a public institution of higher education from referring a delinquent student account or debt to the Central Collection Unit under specified circumstances; requiring a public institution of higher education to allow a student with an unpaid balance of $250 or less on a student account to register for specified courses under specified circumstances; authorizing a State income tax credit, not to exceed $5,000, for specified individuals with specified student loan debt; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1014
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {859832/1
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Brochin) Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {859832/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {193925/1 Rejected (15-31)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) {183421/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) {433421/1
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) {433421/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {233321/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-11)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-46)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {859832/1 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Laid Over (Senator Brochin) Adopted 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {859832/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {193925/1 Rejected (15-31) 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) {183421/1 Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) {433421/1 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) {433421/1 Withdrawn 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Pinsky) {233321/1 Adopted 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56A
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed (34-11) 57
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 59
House 4/06/2016 4/06/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Second Reading Passed 66A
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (90-46) 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 689
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-119, 18-114, 18-1401, 18-1402, 18-19A-01, 18-19A-02, 18-19A-03, 18-19A-04, 18-19A-04.1, 18-19A-05, 18-301, 18-302, 18-303, 18-304, 18-306, 18-905.1 )
(   10-207, 10-208, 10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM