Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Collective Bargaining - State Labor Relations Board and State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Enforcement Authority
Sponsored by
Senator Pugh
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Labor Relations Board and the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board to decide specified controversies and disputes; authorizing the boards to order a respondent to make specified payments to a complainant under specified circumstances; authorizing the boards to bring actions to enforce specified orders; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1280
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-207, 3-209, 3-2A-07, 3-2A-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM