Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
DNA Testing - Postconviction Review
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Conway, Ferguson, Guzzone, Lee, McFadden, Muse, Ramirez, Rosapepe, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the group of persons who may file a specified petition for postconviction DNA testing or a database or log search; requiring a court to order a new trial under specified circumstances for specified classes of persons filing for postconviction DNA testing and having received favorable results; altering the remedy for intentional and willful destruction of DNA evidence; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1411
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - DNA Testing - Postconviction Review
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Referred to interim study by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - DNA Testing - Postconviction Review
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Referred to interim study by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM