Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - Exemptions
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin and Montgomery
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the amount of wages of a judgment debtor that are exempt from attachment; altering the exemption from execution on a judgment for specified items necessary for the practice of any trade or profession; altering the exemption from execution on a judgment for specified items that are held primarily for personal, family, or household use; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/26/2015 2/27/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-601.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM