Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Jones-Rodwell, Garagiola, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, and Ramirez
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council; providing for the membership of the Council; requiring the Governor to consider the geographic and demographic diversity of the State in appointing individuals to the Council; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene and the Secretary of Aging or their designees to cochair the Council; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, with assistance from the Department of Aging, to provide staff support for the Council; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0690
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/04/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {517774/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2013 3/04/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments {517774/1 Report Adopted 38
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/07/2013 3/07/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 43
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Returned Passed 60
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3101 through 13-3106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM