Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election of Circuit Court Judges - Nonpartisan General Election
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Kagan, and Kelley
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a method for the election of judges to the circuit court on a nonpartisan basis at a general election; providing that a candidate for election as judge of a circuit court may be nominated at a primary election; establishing a deadline for the filing of a certificate of candidacy for a candidate for election as a judge of the circuit court; deeming the office of judge of a circuit court vacant under specified circumstances and that the vacancy be filled in a specified manner; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
(   5-203, 5-301, 5-303, 5-703, 8-901 through 8-904, 9-210 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page