Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Regional Advanced Manufacturing Partnership of Maryland
Sponsored by
Harford County Senators
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Renaming the Regional Additive Manufacturing Partnership of Maryland to be the Regional Advanced Manufacturing Partnership of Maryland; renaming the associated fund to be the Regional Advanced Manufacturing Partnership of Maryland Fund; expanding the purposes of the Partnership; altering the membership and composition of the Board; requiring the Board to expand certain apprenticeship opportunities; expanding the political subdivisions that may provide financial support to the Partnership; altering the composition of the Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1172
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2019
Legislative Date
2/04/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {357575/1 Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/01/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2019 2/04/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Economic Development - Regional Advanced Manufacturing Partnership of Maryland
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Favorable with Amendments {357575/1 Adopted 37
Senate 3/01/2019 3/01/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 37
Text - Third - Economic Development - Regional Advanced Manufacturing Partnership of Maryland
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 39
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Referred Ways and Means 40
House 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-1201, 13-1202, 13-1203, 13-1207, 13-1209, 13-1211, 13-211, 9-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM