Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions - Statute of Limitations on Claims
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Middleton, Astle, Kelley, Kittleman, and Pipkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the date by which a medical expert is required to conduct a specified study and report the findings of the study to the Department of Legislative Services; delaying the date by which a claim filed for an occupational disease may be based on alterations to a specified presumption; delaying the date by which alterations to a specified presumption may be construed to apply for a claim filed for an occupational disease; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1314
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-503, 9-711 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM