Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman and Raskin
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying the rights of a subscriber for shares of stock of a corporation; providing that an individual, whether or not then a director, may assent to an action by a consent that will be effective at a future time under specified circumstances; providing that a person, whether or not then a stockholder, may assent to an action by a consent that will be effective at a future date that is no later than 60 days after the consent is delivered to the corporation or its agent; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0522
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2015
Legislative Date
3/05/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908871/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/05/2015 3/05/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {908871/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-202, 2-408, 2-505, 3-106.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM