Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Portable Electronics Insurance - Compensation of Employees of Vendor, Disclosures to Customers, and Study
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier and Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a vendor of portable electronics insurance or an authorized representative of the vendor may compensate employees of the vendor or an authorized representative in a specified manner; altering the content of disclosures that a vendor of portable electronics insurance must provide to customers under specified circumstances; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to make specified determinations and review specified laws, practices, guidelines, and standards relating to limited lines insurance; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1011
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {847574/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {847574/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 55A
House 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-703, 10-705 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM