Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electric Vehicles - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Reciprocity With Virginia
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, under specified circumstances, that electric vehicles registered in Virginia that qualify for the use of high occupancy vehicle (HOV) lanes in Virginia be allowed to use HOV lanes in Maryland; requiring the State Highway Administration to adopt specified regulations; making the Act subject to a specified contingency related to enactment of a similar Act in Virginia providing for reciprocity for electric vehicles registered in Maryland; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0683 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM