Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of Wages
Sponsored by
Senators Garagiola, Benson, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Gladden, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, King, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Robey, Rosapepe, Stone, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying the amount of the State minimum wage rate that is in effect for specified time periods; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to set the rate in a specified manner on or after a specified date or under specified circumstances; requiring that the Commissioner publish the rate in the Maryland Register on or before a specified date each year; repealing the exemption from the Maryland Wage and Hour Law for specified individuals; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1204
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-403, 3-413, 3-415, 3-419, 3-420, 3-427 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM