Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Permanent Absentee Ballot List
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring certain guidelines for absentee voting established by the State Board of Elections to provide for a permanent absentee ballot list; providing that all voters are eligible for permanent absentee ballot status; authorizing a voter to apply for permanent absentee ballot status in a certain manner; authorizing a voter to apply for permanent absentee ballot status at any time; requiring a voter to specify in the permanent absentee ballot application one of certain methods by which the voter chooses to receive an absentee ballot; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0333 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Permanent Absentee Ballot List
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Election Law – Permanent Absentee Ballot List
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/4/2021 4:53 PM
Click to return on the top page