Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Qualifying Biomass
Sponsored by
Senators Garagiola, Ferguson, Klausmeier, Montgomery, Pinsky, Ramirez, Raskin, and Young
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the eligibility of qualifying biomass as a Tier 1 renewable source for the renewable energy portfolio standard to qualifying biomass used at a generation unit that started commercial operation on or after January 1, 2005, and that achieves a system efficiency of 65% or more; providing that before January 1, 2018, qualifying biomass used at a generation unit that started commercial operation on or before December 31, 2004, and was certified on or before December 31, 2005, is eligible as a Tier 1 renewable source; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1102
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {187479/1
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Brinkley) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {187479/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Dyson) Adopted (26-19)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {187479/1 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Laid Over (Senator Brinkley) Adopted 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments {187479/1 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/27/2013 3/23/2013 Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Dyson) Adopted (26-19) 54
Senate 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Third Reading Passed (33-13) 55
House 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-701, 7-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM