Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Madaleno, Montgomery, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction Program; stating the purpose of the Program; establishing the Maryland Beverage Recycling Organization; establishing the structure and purpose of the Organization; specifying the membership of the Organization; establishing a Board of Directors for the Organization; specifying the composition of the Board; specifying the election, duration of term, and term limits of members of the Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0982
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1733 through 9-1743 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM