Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Energy Efficiency Programs - Heating, Ventilation, Air Conditioning, and Refrigeration Services
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an affiliate of an electric company from using the electric company's trade name, logo, billing services, mail inserts, advertising, or computer services for a plan or program that provides heating, ventilation, air conditioning, or refrigeration services; requiring the Public Service Commission to determine just and reasonable compensation that an affiliate of an electric company shall provide to customers of the electric company's regulated services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1569
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Second Reading Passed 44
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 First Reading Economic Matters 47
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM