Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing references to the terms "child custody" and "visitation" and substituting the terms "legal decision making" and "parenting time" in certain instances; requiring the court, in determining the appropriate allocation of legal decision making or parenting time between the parties, to consider certain factors; authorizing the court to award joint legal decision making to both parties under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1032
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0368 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-203, 9-101, 9-101.1, 9-101.2, 9-103, 9-104, 9-105, 9-106, 9-107, 9-108, 9-201 through 9-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM