Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Conway, Currie, Feldman, Gladden, Hough, McFadden, Middleton, Montgomery, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Pugh, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Attorney General to take specified steps to identify, collect, and publish in a specified manner laws that impose a specified collateral sanction on a person who is convicted of a specified offense; requiring a State's Attorney to provide specified information to a person charged with an offense; requiring a court to confirm that a specified notice has been received and is understood by a specified person; providing that a new collateral sanction may be imposed only by a specified procedure; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1059
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301 through 10-317 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM